EP0956441 - UNFOLDING INJECTOR TUBE FOR PROPULSION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société Nationale d'Etude et de Construction de Moteurs d' Aviation 2, boulevard du Général-Martial-Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERRIER, Bruno 18, rue Jacques Brissot F-33160 Saint Médard en Jalles / FR | 02 /
SANS, Jean-Luc 2, rue Edgar Degas F-33600 Pessac / FR | 03 /
COLLIGNON, Laurent 16, rue des Saules F-33510 Andernos / FR | [2001/48] |
Former [1999/46] | 01 /
PERRIER, Bruno 7, avenue Auguste Ferret F-33110 Le Bouscat / FR | ||
02 /
SANS, Jean-Luc 2, rue Edgar Degas F-33600 Pessac / FR | |||
03 /
COLLIGNON, Laurent 16, rue des Saules F-33510 Andernos / FR | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Joly, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97953949.1 | 24.12.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997FR02425 | Priority number, date | FR19960015958 | 24.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9615958 | [1999/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828533 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956441 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956441 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02K9/97 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
F02K9/976 (EP,US);
F02K9/978 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | ENTFALTBARE SCHUBDÜSE | [1999/46] | English: | UNFOLDING INJECTOR TUBE FOR PROPULSION UNIT | [1999/46] | French: | DIVERGENT DEPLOYABLE POUR PROPULSEUR | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3526365 (DARROW WARREN E JR, et al) [Y] 1-5,12-15 * abstract;; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US4272956 (LAMERE GARLAND C, et al) [Y] 1-5,12-15 * column W *; | [YD]EP0516519 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [YD] 1-5,12-15 * abrégé;; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]FR2724979 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]) [Y] 1-5,12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2503794 (EUROP PROPULSION [FR]); | [A]US4022129 (DAY JOHN E, et al); | [A]US3776466 (RAY W); | [A]US3237402 (BERNARD STEVERDING); | [A]GB2029511 (HERCULES INC); | [A]EP0661436 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]US4779799 (JENCEK PREMYSL [US]) | by applicant | EP0516519 | FR9515634 |