EP0973372 - VINEYARD APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR VINEYARD MECHANIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS 2404 North University Avenue Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states The University of Arkansas 2404 North University Avenue Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS, Justin, R. 1876 Albright Drive Springdale, AR 72764 / US | 02 /
OLDRIDGE, Tommy, L. 1118 Concord Street Lowell, AR 72745 / US | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co L.L.P., 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | ||
Former [2000/04] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 97954251.1 | 24.12.1997 | [2000/04] | WO1997US23950 | Priority number, date | US19970035216P | 07.01.1997 Original published format: US 35216 P | US19970049285P | 10.06.1997 Original published format: US 49285 P | US19970950301 | 14.10.1997 Original published format: US 950301 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9830078 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0973372 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01G17/00, A01D46/28, A01G17/02 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
A01D46/28 (EP,US);
A01G17/026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/04] | A01G17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | WEINBAUVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND WEINBAUMECHANISIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2000/04] | English: | VINEYARD APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR VINEYARD MECHANIZATION | [2000/04] | French: | MATERIEL VITICOLE, ET SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MECANISATION DE LA VITICULTURE | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 22.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/47] | Divisional application(s) | EP06006999.4 / EP1673970 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3371473 (BURTON CHARLES G); | [A]US4703584 (CHAZALNOEL CLAUDE [FR]); | [X]US5101618 (OLDRIDGE TOMMY L [US]); | [X]FR2723507 (BINGER FRANCE SARL [FR]); | [A]US5515645 (GOBER GLENN D [US]); | [XT]US5737908 (ANDELFINGER GEORGES [FR]) | by applicant | US3426517 | US3439482 | US3473311 | US3559386 | US3563016 | US3601964 | US3613343 | US3715876 |