EP0946122 - APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING BLOOD FOR DIAGNOSTIC TESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/40] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING BLOOD FOR DIAGNOSTIC TESTS | ||
[2004/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | 14.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUNNINGHAM, David, D. 40097 North Highway 45 Lake Villa, IL 60046 / US | 02 /
HENNING, Timothy, P. 189 Sheffield Lane Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | 03 /
SHAIN, Eric, B. 459 Grove Street Glencoe, IL 60022 / US | 04 /
YOUNG, Douglas, F. 212 Bonnie Brae Avenue Grayslake, IL 60030 / US | 05 /
LOWERY, Michael, G. Apartment 201 33720 Royal Oak Lane Wildwood, IL 60030 / US | 06 /
SCHAPIRA, Thomas, G. 21616-107th Street Bristol, WI 53104 / US | 07 /
GRAHAM, Hugh, W. 3408 Cheyenne Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | 08 /
MUETTERTIES, Andrew, J. 27321 N. Oakleaf Court Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | 09 /
CHAMBERS, Geoffrey, R. 32 Elgood Avenue, Northwood Middlesex HA6 3QS / GB | 10 /
HUGHES, Graham, J. 101 Old Road Headington Oxford OX3 8SX / GB | 11 /
WATKIN, Jared, L. 11 Kysbie Place Abingdon Oxon OX14 1XZ / GB | 12 /
PROKOP, Gary, F. 830 Pick Street Wheaton, IL 60187 / US | 13 /
GOLDFARB, Joshua, P. Apartment 3C 37 East Division Chicago, IL 60610 / US | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/40] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97954551.4 | 04.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997US22618 | Priority number, date | US19960759698 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: US 759698 | US19970036395P | 24.01.1997 Original published format: US 36395 P | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9824366 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0946122 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946122 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
A61B5/15186 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/1486 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150068 (EP,US);
A61B5/150076 (EP,US);
A61B5/150099 (EP,US);
A61B5/150221 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150664 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US);
A61B5/15125 (EP,US);
A61B5/1519 (EP,US);
A61B5/15194 (EP,US);
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/411 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0295 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/40] | A61B5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/40] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BLUTGEWINNUNG FÜR DIAGNOSTISCHE TESTS | [2004/51] | English: | APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING BLOOD FOR DIAGNOSTIC TESTS | [2004/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR PRELEVER DU SANG EN VUE D'ESSAIS DIAGNOSTIQUES | [2004/51] |
Former [1999/40] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BLUTGEWINNUNG FÜR DIAGNOSTISCHE TESTS | ||
Former [1999/40] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING BLOOD FOR DIAGNOSTIC TESTS | ||
Former [1999/40] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRELEVER DU SANG EN VUE D'ESSAIS DIAGNOSTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01107425.9 / EP1120084 | EP01107426.7 / EP1112717 | EP01107461.4 / EP1112718 | EP01107462.2 / EP1120085 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2005 | BE | 08.06.2005 | CH | 08.06.2005 | LI | 08.06.2005 | NL | 08.06.2005 | [2006/22] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | ||
CH | 08.06.2005 | ||
LI | 08.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.06.2005 | |
BE | 08.06.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2803345 (EISINGER EMIL) [X] 96,98,100,101* figure 5 *; | [X]EP0021798 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 53,56,57,62,65,66,69,70,75,78-81,85 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0212906 (DOMBROWSKI MITCHELL P) [X] 96,98,103,104,106 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 2; figure 3 *; | [XA]EP0230472 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 53,57,66,70 * the whole document * [A] 79,82; | [XA]DE3708031 (WAGNER WOLFGANG DR MED [DE]) [X] 19-21,23,26-29 * the whole document * [A] 108,126-130,132-134; | [Y]EP0254203 (PERSONAL DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [Y] 108-113,126,127,130-134 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2222251 (WAGNER WOLFGANG) [X] 19-23,27,29,30 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0371503 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 53,54,58,61,66,67,71,74 * the whole document * [A] 79,82; | [XA]WO9109139 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) [X] 53,54,56,57,61,66,67,69,70,74 * page 5, line 8 - page 7, line 9 * * page 18, line 26 - line 34; figure - * [A] 79,81; | [Y]US5037431 (SUMMERS DAVID A [MN], et al) [Y] 25 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0449525 (CASCADE MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 108-113,126-131,133 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9215863 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) [X] 53,56,58,62,66,69,71,75,79,82,85 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0520296 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 31-35,37-40,43-45,48,49 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9303673 (CASCADE MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 53,56,58,62,65,66,69,71,75,78-80,82,85 * the whole document * [A] 108,109,126-130; | [XY]EP0575952 (SUZUKI YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 96,98,100,102 * column 5, line 28 - line 33 * * column 8, line 10 - line 24; figure - * [Y] 108-113,126,127,130-134; | [YD]WO9409713 (VENISECT INC [US]) [YD] 24,26 * the whole document *; | [XDAY]US5320607 (ISHIBASHI HIROMU [JP]) [XD] 19,20 * the whole document * [A] 96,98,103,107 [Y] 24-26; | [X]EP0671146 (ADVANCE KK [JP]) [X] 19-21,23 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9637148 (ADVANCE KK [JP], et al) [X] 31-35,43 * the whole document * [A] 37-40,44,45,48,49; | EP0797951 [ ] (ADVANCE KK [JP]) | by applicant | US4203446 | US4653513 | US4775361 | USRE32922E | US4990154 | US5165418 | US5320607 | US5487748 |