EP0964866 - 5-(DIOXABICYCLOHEPT-6-YL)-CYCLOHEXENONE OXIME ETHERS, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHEINHEIMER, Joachim Merziger Strasse 24 D-67063 Ludgwishafen / DE | 02 /
MAYWALD, Volker Berner Weg 24 D-67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
KARDORFF, Uwe D 3.4 D-68159 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
WESTPHALEN, Karl-Otto Mausbergweg 58 D-67346 Speyer / DE | 05 /
MISSLITZ, Ulf Mandelring 74 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 06 /
WALTER, Helmut Grünstadter Strasse 82 D-67283 Obrigheim / DE | [1999/51] | Application number, filing date | 97954747.8 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/51] | WO1997EP07215 | Priority number, date | DE1997100455 | 09.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19700455 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9830565 | Date: | 16.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964866 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/04, A01N43/90, // (C07D493/04, 311:00, 303:00) | [1999/51] | CPC: |
C07D493/04 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/51] | Title | German: | 5-(DIOXABICYCLOHEPT-6-YL)-CYCLOHEXENONOXIMETHER, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1999/51] | English: | 5-(DIOXABICYCLOHEPT-6-YL)-CYCLOHEXENONE OXIME ETHERS, THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE | [1999/51] | French: | ETHERS D'OXIME DE 5-(DIOXABICYCLOHEPT-6-YLE)-CYCLOHEXENONE, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 02.11.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0230235 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1,9 * claims 1,4 * |