EP0946311 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SHEET METAL PART BY FORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiessl, Gerhard Sonnenstrasse 4 85092 Kösching / DE | 02 /
Bergmann, Hans-Wilhelm Irisstrasse 9 90542 Eckental / DE | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Geissler, Manfred Audi AG Abteilung I/EK-P 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Geissler, Manfred Audi AG, Abteilung I/EK-P 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 97954916.9 | 15.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997EP07029 | Priority number, date | DE1996153543 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19653543 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828097 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946311 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946311 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21D22/00, B21D53/88, B62D65/00 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
B21D22/20 (EP,US);
B21D22/26 (EP,US);
C21D1/673 (EP,US);
C21D2221/00 (EP,US);
C21D2221/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES BLECHFORMTEILES DURCH UMFORMEN | [1999/40] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A SHEET METAL PART BY FORMING | [1999/40] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE PIECE FACONNEE EN TOLE PAR FORMAGE | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]DE2332287 (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN) [DX] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE4425033 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DX] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4307563 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * the whole document * |