EP0931778 - Refractory article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIESSMANN WERKE GmbH & CO. Viessmannstrasse 35107 Allendorf/Eder / DE | [1999/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strobl, Uwe Am Birnbaum 8 35075 Gladenbach / DE | 02 /
Guthardt, Harry Bülower Strasse 10 35066 Frankenberg / DE | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 Postfach 700245 63427 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1999/30] | Wolf, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Günter Wolf, An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100107.6 | 07.01.1998 | [1999/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0931778 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0931778 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/26, C04B28/24, // (C04B28/26, 14:20, 14:46, 38:08) | [1999/30] | CPC: |
C04B28/26 (EP);
C04B28/24 (EP);
C04B2111/28 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/24, C04B14/104, C04B14/465, C04B18/082 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/104, C04B14/202, C04B14/465, C04B18/082 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/104, C04B14/202, C04B14/465, C04B38/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/14] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Feuerfestformkörper | [1999/30] | English: | Refractory article | [1999/30] | French: | Corps réfractaire | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 22.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 02.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 10.04.2002 | IT | 10.04.2002 | NL | 10.04.2002 | DK | 10.07.2002 | [2008/08] |
Former [2003/46] | GB | 10.04.2002 | |
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
DK | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GB | 10.04.2002 | |
NL | 10.04.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 10.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | PL136546 [ ] (POLITECHNIKA POZNANSKA ET AL); | [A]GB1499804 (HARTFREE A) [A] 6 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2041384 (PENNINGTON J) [X] 1-3,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0723945 (COMTRADE LTD [CH]) [A] 6 * example 1; claim - *; | [EL]DE19627961 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [EL] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900514), vol. 112, no. 20, Database accession no. 184898j, XP000064972 [A] 1,2 * abstract * |