EP0853055 - Cover for access shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HSB Umwelttechnik GmbH Märkische Strasse 14 58675 Hemer / DE | [1998/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulte Hubert Berkenhofkamp 17 58710 Menden / DE | [1998/29] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100179.5 | 08.01.1998 | [1998/29] | Priority number, date | DE1997200180U | 08.01.1997 Original published format: DE 29700180 U | [1998/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0853055 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/10, E02D29/14 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
B65D90/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/13] |
Former [1998/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Domschachtabdeckung | [1998/29] | English: | Cover for access shaft | [1998/29] | French: | Couvercle de puits d'inspection | [1998/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/47] | 22.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE29501264U (BALD ERWIN ;SCHULTE HUBERT (DE)) [Y] 1-6,12-14 * page 9, line 5 - page 13, line 11 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 7,8; | [Y]DE4412176 (CONOCO MINERALOEL GMBH) [Y] 1-6,12-14 * page 1, line 68 - page 3, line 22 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29504448U (KWADE BETONWERK GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * page 5, line 4 - page 5, line 22 * * figure 2 * |