EP0888983 - Gravity feed rack for order picking [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEDCON MAGAZIJNINRICHTING B.V. Nijverheidsweg 26 NL-7000 AA Doetinchem / NL | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollander, Rudolf Richard Wildenborchseweg 10 7251 KC Vorden / NL | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100244.7 | 09.01.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE19972011710U | 04.07.1997 Original published format: DE 29711710 U | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888983 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0888983 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/08 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B65G1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1999/37] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durchlaufregal zum Kommissionieren | [1999/01] | English: | Gravity feed rack for order picking | [1999/01] | French: | Couloir de roulement pour la préparation de commandes | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 25.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 21.03.2001 | IT | 21.03.2001 | DK | 21.06.2001 | ES | 27.09.2001 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
ES | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | DK | 21.06.2001 | |
FR | 17.08.2001 | ||
ES | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | DK | 21.06.2001 | |
FR | 17.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/17] | FR | 17.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1470439 (DEXION COMINO INT LTD) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 74 - line 120 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0241579 (AGNOFF CHARLES) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 11 - column 7, line 46; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4182440 (JUERGENS WALTER [DE]) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 45; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE9305450U (NEDCON MAGAZIJNINRICHTING) [A] 1 * page 4, line 32 - page 6, line 26 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3832776 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [PX]DE29711710U (NEDCON MAGAZIJNINRICHTING BV [NL]) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * |