EP0859093 - Outlet device for a toilet flush tank with selective full or partial flush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider, Helmhold, Dr. Petersbachweg 1 / Kölner Strasse 59a 57610 Altenkirchen / DE | [1998/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Ekkehard Dipl.-Ing. Petersbachweg 4 57610 Altenkirchen / DE | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Langmaack, Jürgen, et al Patentanwälte Maxton & Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Langmaack, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Maxton . Maxton . Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100346.0 | 10.01.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | DE1997202564U | 14.02.1997 Original published format: DE 29702564 U | [1998/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0859093 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0859093 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0859093 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/14 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
E03D1/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, NL [1999/35] |
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ablaufvorrichtung an einem WC-Spülkasten mit wahlweiser Voll- oder Teilspülung | [1998/34] | English: | Outlet device for a toilet flush tank with selective full or partial flush | [1998/34] | French: | Dispositif d'écoulement pour réservoir de chasse d'eau de toilette permettant sélectivement le rinçage complet ou partiel | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   07.03.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.03.2004 | NL | 24.03.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/13] | NL | 24.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2662194 (SPMP SA [FR]) [A] 1,3 * page 5, line 8 - line 35 * * page 6, line 30 - page 10, line 32; figure - *; | [A]FR2676480 (TOLBERT TIMOTHY [US]) [A] 1,3,5,7 * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 8 * * page 7, line 4 - page 11, line 10; figure - *; | [A]DE4122394 (MENGE HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column 3, line 26 - line 43 * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9311189U (GEBERIT AG [CH]) [A] 1,3* page 3, line 19 - page 7, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0723050 (FRIATEC KERAMIK KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,7 * column 3, line 32 - column 8, line 45; figure - * |