EP0854074 - Power steering control valve with noise reduction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive U.S. LLC 12025 Tech Center Drive Livonia, MI 48150 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states TRW Automotive U.S. LLC 12025 Tech Center Drive Livonia, Michigan 48150 / US | ||
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states TRW INC. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strong, Daniel J. 17429 Contesti DRive Clinton Township, Michigan 48035 / US | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/30] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100564.8 | 14.01.1998 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | US19970783648 | 15.01.1997 Original published format: US 783648 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0854074 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0854074 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854074 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/083 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
B62D5/0837 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86654 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/30] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Servolenkungssteuerventil mit Geräuschsverminderung | [1998/30] | English: | Power steering control valve with noise reduction | [1998/30] | French: | Soupape de commande de direction assistée avec réduction de bruit | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 08.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH0390475 ; | [XAY]US5417244 (BEHRENS HERMAN W [US], et al) [X] 10 * column 2, line 17 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-5 * * column 7, line 18 - column 9, line 24; figure 7 * [A] 1,4-9[Y] 3 | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910708), vol. 015, no. 267, Database accession no. (M - 1133), & JP03090475 A 19910416 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1,4-6,9,10 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 2,7 [Y] 3 |