EP0856927 - Retention devire of a surge protection apparatus in an electrical box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pollmann Elektrotechnik GmbH Wiedenbrücker Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [1998/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franz, Wilhelm Sedanstrasse 110 59227 Ahlen / DE | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Hassler, Werner Asenberg 62 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Hassler, Werner, Dr. Asenberg 62 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 98100980.6 | 21.01.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | DE1997102939 | 28.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19702939 | [1998/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856927 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856927 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12, H02B1/044 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
H02G3/08 (EP);
H02G3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, NL, SE [1999/16] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Überspannungsschutzgerätes in einer elektrischen Dose | [1998/32] | English: | Retention devire of a surge protection apparatus in an electrical box | [1998/32] | French: | Dispositif de fixation dans un boîtier électrique d'un appareil de protection conter les surtensions | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 25.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DE | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.04.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2275113 (ZEUS RAPIZZI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-7 * page 2, line 10 - line 15 * * page 3, line 24 - line 35 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US4053082 (ULLMAN FREDERICK E) [A] 1* column 2, line 45 - line 54; figure 1 * |