EP0857601 - Motor vehicle fuel tank filler device comprising an earthed conductive valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie de Matériel et d'Equipements Techniques C.O.M.E.T. 27, Avenue Etienne Audibert 60300 Senlis / FR | [2000/13] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states PAUL JOURNEE S.A. F-60240 Reilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Romanek, Christian 57, rue de Paris 60430 Noailles / FR | 02 /
Lefevre, Jean Pierre 15, rue Jean-Baptiste Crèvecoeur 60240 Lattainville / FR | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | ||
Former [1998/33] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services, Propriété Industrielle, 2, rue André Boulle - B.P. 150 94017 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 98101160.4 | 23.01.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | FR19970001401 | 05.02.1997 Original published format: FR 9701401 | [1998/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857601 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0857601 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/04, B65D90/46 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
B60K15/04 (EP);
B60K2015/03401 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1999/17] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Füllen eines Kraftstofftankes eines Kraftfahrzeuges versehen mit einer leitenden geerdeten Klappe | [1998/33] | English: | Motor vehicle fuel tank filler device comprising an earthed conductive valve | [1998/33] | French: | Dispositif de remplissage d'un réservoir de carburant de véhicule automobile comportant un clapet conducteur relié à la masse électrique | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/15] | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5431199 (BENJEY ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6 * column 4, line 10 - line 19 * * column 4, line 31 - line 32 * * figure 5; claim 7 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 3 * [A] 2,4; | [A]US3967660 (RUSSELL JAMES E) [A] 1 * column W * |