EP0947480 - Process for making subfloors as insulation layer for floors in new and old buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dipl.-Ing. Hans Goidinger Bau-und Leichtbeton Gesellschaft m.b.H. Salzburger Strasse 40 6112 Wattens / AT | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruckbauer, Alexander Höfferstrasse 12 5280 Braunau a.I. / AT | 02 /
Goidingeeer, Arno Mag. Schmalzgasse 2 6060 Tulfes bei Hall i.T. / AT | [2001/12] |
Former [1999/40] | 01 /
Bruckbauer, Alexander Höfferstrasse 2 5280 Braunau a.I. / AT | ||
02 /
Goidingeeer, Arno Mag. Schmalzgasse 2 6060 Tulfes bei Hall i.T. / AT | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/40] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101229.7 | 24.01.1998 | [1999/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0947480 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0947480 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B20/10, C04B26/26, C04B40/06, E04F15/12, C08L95/00 | [1999/40] | CPC: |
E04F15/12 (EP);
C04B20/1044 (EP);
C04B26/26 (EP);
C04B40/0625 (EP);
C08L95/00 (EP);
C04B2111/60 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B20/1044, C04B16/08 (EP);
C04B26/26, C04B14/26, C04B14/28, C04B14/365, C04B16/08, C04B24/34, C04B40/0625 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L25/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] |
Former [1999/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 31.07.1998 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Unterböden als Dämmschicht für Estriche bei Alt- und Neubauten | [1999/40] | English: | Process for making subfloors as insulation layer for floors in new and old buildings | [1999/40] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de dalles comme couche d'isolation pour planchers dans des nouveaux ou vieux bâtiments | [1999/40] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 21.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB, GR, IE | 14.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.05.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.03.2001 | DK | 21.06.2001 | PT | 21.06.2001 | SE | 21.06.2001 | ES | 27.09.2001 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/46] | FI | 21.03.2001 | |
DK | 21.06.2001 | ||
PT | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | FI | 21.03.2001 | |
PT | 21.06.2001 | ||
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | FI | 21.03.2001 | |
SE | 21.06.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 21.06.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2049248 (DEUTSHE PERLITE GMBH) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE9410620U (SZOELLOESKEI LASZLO [DE]) [A] 1* page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph L; claim - *; | [DA]DE9312916U (GOIDINGER BAU & LEICHTBETON [AT]) [DA] 1; | [A]DE29708419U (VIALIT GMBH OESTERR [AT]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 16 - line 23 * |