EP0858833 - Copper-based catalysts, process for producing them and their use, and method for preparation of alkylhalogenosylanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Bayer Silicones GmbH & Co. KG Falkenberg 1 40699 Erkrath / DE | For all designated states NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE AG Hovestrasse 50 20539 Hamburg / DE | [1998/43] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
For all designated states NORDDEUTSCHE AFFINERIE AG Hovestrasse 50 20539 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langner, Bernd, Dr. Glockenheide 11 21423 Winsen/Luhe / DE | 02 /
Stantke, Peter Feldstrasse 10 21641 Apensen / DE | 03 /
Leister, Thomas Mittelschlag 6 23560 Lübeck / DE | 04 /
Steiner, Matthias-Sven, Dr. Gustav-Freytag-Strasse 2 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 05 /
Degen, Bruno, Dr. Sommerhausen 60 53804 Much / DE | 06 /
Schartau, Wolfgang, Dr. Am Wasserturm 31 51379 Leverkusen / DE | 07 /
Licht, Elke, Dr. Am Sonnenhang 23 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/43] |
Former [1998/34] | Siegers, Britta, Dr. Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101269.3 | 20.11.1996 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | DE1995144748 | 01.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19544748 | DE1996119161 | 11.05.1996 Original published format: DE 19619161 | [1998/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0858833 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0858833 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858833 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/72, C07F7/16, B01J37/00 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
B01J37/0072 (EP,US);
B01J23/72 (EP,US);
C07F7/16 (EP,US);
B01J23/76 (EP,US);
B01J37/0081 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/34] | B01J23/72 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1998/34] | Title | German: | Katalysatoren auf Kupferbasis, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung und ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von alkylhalogensilanen | [1998/34] | English: | Copper-based catalysts, process for producing them and their use, and method for preparation of alkylhalogenosylanes | [1998/34] | French: | Catalyseur à base de cuivre, procédé pour leur production ainsi que leur emploi et procédé pour la fabrication d'alkylhalogenosilanes | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96118554.3 / EP0776697 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.03.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/41] | NL | 12.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4218387 (DEGEN BRUNO [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,5,6,8-15 * column 3, line 6 - line 7; example 6; claims 1,4,6 *; | [AD]US4504597 (KLAR ERHARD [US], et al) [AD] 1,5,6,8-10,15,16 * claims 1-6 *; | [AD]US4520130 (HASHIGUCHI DON H [US], et al) [AD] 1,5,6,8-10,13-15* claims 1-3 *; | [A]GB2153697 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1,2,5,8,9,13-15 * claims 1,10,17 *; | [XA]US4864044 (LEWIS KENRICK M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-11,13-15 * column 11, line 38 - line 43; tables 2,3 * [A] 8 |