EP0857524 - Wire-bundle former [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Dieter Schützenstrasse 41b 57072 Siegen / DE | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1998/33] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98101722.1 | 02.02.1998 | [1998/33] | Priority number, date | DE1997104423 | 06.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19704423 | [1998/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0857524 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0857524 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/24 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
B21C47/24 (EP,US);
B21C47/242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, IT, SE [2001/50] |
Former [1998/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drahtbund-Bildestation | [1998/33] | English: | Wire-bundle former | [1998/33] | French: | Dispositif pour former bobines de fil | [1998/33] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 17.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3525089 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3109110 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [A]DE2144510 (WERNER HERDIECKERHOFF FA DR) [A] 1 * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 1 *; | [A]DE2842745 (KOCKS GMBH FRIEDRICH) [A] 1 * page 7 *; | [A]DE3710449 (THAELMANN SCHWERMASCHBAU VEB [DD]) [A] 1 * column 3 *; | [A]JPS56165664 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820403), vol. 006, no. 050, Database accession no. (M - 120), & JP56165664 A 19811219 (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |