EP0865091 - Laminated lithium-ion cell and process of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARTA Microbattery GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | [2003/02] |
Former [2002/22] | For all designated states Microbatterie GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states VARTA Gerätebatterie GmbH Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states VARTA Batterie Aktiengesellschaft Am Leineufer 51 30419 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bäuerlein, Peter, Dr. Röntgenstrasse 12 65520 Bad Camberg / DE | 02 /
Oberhauser, Johanna Hornauer Strasse 72 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 03 /
Praas, Hans-Walter, Dr. Gerverotstrasse 6 73479 Ellwangen / DE | 04 /
Schomann, Hermann Joseph von Eichendorff-Strasse 8 63225 Langen / DE | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/38] | Kaiser, Dieter Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Gundelhardtstrasse 72 65779 Kelkheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102041.5 | 06.02.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | DE1997109783 | 10.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19709783 | [1998/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865091 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0865091 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/40, H01M2/16, H01M4/02 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
H01M10/05 (EP,US);
H01M10/0585 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M4/131 (KR);
H01M4/133 (KR);
H01M4/134 (KR);
H01M4/136 (KR);
H01M4/72 (KR);
H01M4/74 (KR);
H01M4/806 (KR);
H01M4/808 (KR);
H01M50/414 (KR);
H01M50/491 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (KR);
Y02P70/50 (KR);
Y10T29/49112 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/38] | H01M10/40, H01M4/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI [2004/46] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Laminierte Lithium-Ionen-Zelle und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/38] | English: | Laminated lithium-ion cell and process of manufacture | [1998/38] | French: | Elément laminé aux ions lithium et procédé de fabrication | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 28.02.2007 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0385802 (MHB JOINT VENTURE [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 18 * * column 4, line 20 - line 36 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 10 *; | [X]US4969254 (DAHN JEFFERY R [CA], et al) [X] 1,6,8,9 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 19 * * column 5, line 43 - line 61 * * column 6, line 23 - line 59 * * column 7, line 19 - line 34 * * column 7, line 60 - line 66 *; | [X]US5360684 (DUVAL MICHEL [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3, line 56 - line 65 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 7 *; | [X]US5470357 (SCHMUTZ CAROLINE N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * column 3, line 24 - line 59 * * column 4, line 9 - line 25 * * column 4, line 35 - line 51 * * examples 6-12,14 *; | [X]WO9607213 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]) [X] 1,2,5-10* the whole document *; | [X]WO9627910 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6; | [PX]EP0817294 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-6 * page 2, line 43 - line 52 * * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 17 - line 29 * * page 5, line 26 - line 45 * * page 6, line 3 - line 5 * * page 6, line 57 - page 7, line 21 * * page 8, line 1 - line 13 * * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 23 * * page 12, line 38 - line 56 * * page 15, line 44 - line 54 * * examples 4,13 * * page 12 * |