EP0859304 - Method and device to set the temperature of a processing medium,especially the scouring liquor of a washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhoferstrasse 135 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [1998/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinmüller, Harald Brünst 2a 91611 Lehrberg / DE | [1998/34] | Application number, filing date | 98102149.6 | 07.02.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | DE1997105666 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19705666 | [1998/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859304 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0859304 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, G05D23/32, G05D27/00, H05B1/02, D06F33/02, F26B25/22 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
D06F33/36 (EP,US);
G05D23/1951 (EP,US);
D06F2103/16 (EP,US);
D06F2105/10 (EP,US);
D06F39/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/18] |
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Einstellen der Temperatur eines Prozessmediums, insbesondere der Waschflotte in einer Waschmaschine | [1998/34] | English: | Method and device to set the temperature of a processing medium,especially the scouring liquor of a washing machine | [1998/34] | French: | Methode et dispositif de fixation de la température du milieu d'un procédé, particulièrement du produit de récurage dans une machine à laver | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 19.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]DE19625868 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PA] 1-13 * page 2, lines 3-18 * * page 3, lines 2-68 * * figure 6; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0523864 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, lines 3-7 * * page 4, lines 15-50 * * page 8, line 35 - page 23, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5219119 (KASPER GARY P [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 5 * * column 4, line 4 - column 10, line 41; figures 1,3 * |