EP0862234 - Fuel cell plant with reformer and carbon monoxide sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DBB Fuel Cell Engines GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | [1999/44] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states DBB Fuel Cell Engines Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walz, Hans Frieder Am Sonnenblick 1 73312 Geislingen / DE | 02 /
zur Megede, Detlef, Dr. Von-Rehlingen-Strasse 7A 89347 Bubesheim / DE | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Kocher, Klaus-Peter Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, FTP/S - C106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Kocher, Klaus-Peter Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft, FTP/S - C106 70546 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102188.4 | 09.02.1998 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | DE1997107814 | 27.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19707814 | [1998/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862234 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862234 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/06 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
C01B3/32 (EP,US);
C01B3/34 (EP,US);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/0612 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0405 (EP,US);
C01B2203/044 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0445 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1223 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1676 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1685 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1999/19] |
Former [1998/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brennstoffzellen-Anlage mit Reformer und Kohlenmonoxyd-Sensor | [1998/36] | English: | Fuel cell plant with reformer and carbon monoxide sensor | [1998/36] | French: | Système de piles à combustible avec dispositif de reformage et detecteur de monoxide de carbone | [1998/36] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 11.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5951480 ; | [Y]EP0692835 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,5 * page 7, columns 50-55; figures 1,6,7,9 * * page 10, lines 21-29 * * page 11, lines 46-55 *; | [YD]EP0710996 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [YD] 3,5 * column 16, line 31 - column 19, line 33 * * column 24, line 46 - column 25, line 7 * * figures 8,9 *; | [DA]GB2250130 (VICKERS SHIPBUILDING & ENG [GB], et al) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0710835 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840703), vol. 008, no. 142, Database accession no. (E - 254), & JP59051480 A 19840324 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [Y] 3,5 | [A] - HOHLEIN B ET AL, "Hydrogen from methanol for fuel cells in mobile systems: development of a compact reformer", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, (19960708), vol. 1-2, no. 61, page 143-147, XP004071501 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(96)02357-9 |