EP0858773 - Device for producing X-rays of parts of a human body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/34] | Method and device for producing X-rays of parts of a human body | ||
[2001/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Fabrikstrasse 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [1999/12] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states Sirona Dental Systems GmbH & Co.KG Fabrikstrasse 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeller, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Adolf-Reichwein-Strasse 29 61267 Neu-Anspach / DE | 02 /
Günther, Werner, Ing.grad. Fichtestrasse 19 64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Schulze-Ganzlin, Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing. Le Coteaur-Strasse 12 64653 Lorsch / DE | 04 /
Döbert, Michael Zedernstrasse 2 64653 Lorsch / DE | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Sommer, Peter PRIO Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 22 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Sommer, Peter Sommer Patentanwalt und European Patent and Trademark Attorney Am Oberen Luisenpark 5 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/34] | Isenbruck, Günter, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Frohwitter-Geissler & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102209.8 | 09.02.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | DE19971006102 | 17.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706102 | [1998/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0858773 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0858773 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858773 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/14, A61B6/06 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
A61B6/4233 (EP,US);
A61B6/51 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/34] | A61B6/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, IT, SE [1999/50] |
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erstellung von Röntgenaufnahmen von Körperteilen eines Menschen | [2001/50] | English: | Device for producing X-rays of parts of a human body | [2001/50] | French: | Appareil pour produire des radiographies des parties du corps humain | [2001/50] |
Former [1998/34] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erstellung von Röntgenaufnahmen von Körperteilen eines Menschen | ||
Former [1998/34] | Method and device for producing X-rays of parts of a human body | ||
Former [1998/34] | Procédé et appareil pour produire des radiographies des parties du corps humain | Examination procedure | 13.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 09.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02006254.3 / EP1219244 | EP04102217.9 / EP1452137 | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.12.2002 | [2003/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4188537 (FRANKE KURT [DE]) [X] 7-9 * column 3, line 20 - line 55; figure 2; claim 2 *; | [A]EP0141448 (OPTISCHE IND DE OUDE DELFT NV [NL]) [A] 7 * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 15; figure -; claim 5 *; | [A]DE9103670U (TRANSFORMATOREN UND RÖNTGENWERK GMBH) [A] 7* the whole document *; | [XD]EP0632994 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [XD] 7 * column 7, line 21 - column 8, line 8; figure 8; claim - *; | [A]US5600699 (SUZUKI MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 7 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 63; figure 4 * | by applicant | EP0229971 |