EP0936569 - Method und circuit arrangement for frequency multiplication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/33] | Method and circuit for frequency multiplication | ||
[1999/34] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [1999/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Rheinstrasse 18 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Borchert, Uwe Rudolf, et al Puschmann & Borchert Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102333.6 | 11.02.1998 | [1999/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936569 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06G1/00, G06G7/20, G06G7/22 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
G06G7/22 (EP,US);
G06G7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zur Frequenzvervielfachung | [1999/33] | English: | Method und circuit arrangement for frequency multiplication | [1999/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de circuit pour multiplication de fréquence | [1999/33] |
Former [1999/33] | Method and circuit for frequency multiplication | Examination procedure | 18.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 20.08.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2086627 (BEI ELECTRONICS) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [X] - VON HUBER K, "On applications of Chebyshev polynomials in circuit design", FREQUENZ, JAN.-FEB. 1998, FACHVERLAG SCHIELE & SCHON, GERMANY, ISSN 0016-1136, vol. 52, no. 1-2, pages 11 - 13, XP002067845 [X] 1,3-10,2 * page 11, column L, paragraph L - page 12, column R, paragraph 3; figures 1-4; table 1 * * page 13, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph L * |