EP0858861 - Drawing pin for pallet or carrier for holding workpieces during machining [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stark Spannsysteme GmbH Komminger Strasse 48 6840 Götzis / AT | [2002/32] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Stark Werkzeuggesellschaft mbH Kommingerstrasse 48 6840 Götzis / AT | ||
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states Stark, Emil, jr. Komminger Strasse 48 A-6840 Götzis / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stark, Emil Kommingerstrasse 48 6840 Götzis / AT | [2002/13] |
Former [1998/34] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | von Ahsen, Erwin-Detlef Von Ahsen, Nachtwey & Kollegen Anwaltskanzlei Wilhelm-Herbst-Strasse 5 28359 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | von Ahsen, Erwin-Detlef, Dipl.-Ing. von Ahsen, Nachtwey & Kollegen Postfach 10 77 40 28077 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Bischof, Hans-Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. Schwalbenstrasse 10 Postfach 2105 28852 Syke / DE | ||
Former [1998/34] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10 88131 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102503.4 | 13.02.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | DE19971005684 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19705684 | [1998/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858861 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858861 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q7/14, B23Q16/02 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
B23Q1/0072 (EP,US);
Y10T409/3056 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30616 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307448 (EP,US);
Y10T409/308624 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30868 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309016 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/18] |
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einzugsnippel für eine Palette oder Aufspannplatte zur Halterung von Werkstücken zwecks spanabhebender Bearbeitung | [1998/34] | English: | Drawing pin for pallet or carrier for holding workpieces during machining | [1998/34] | French: | Cheville de connection pour palette ou porte-pièce, servant de support pour des pièces à usiner | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2000 | 28.02.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2003 | GB | 13.02.2003 | CH | 28.02.2003 | LI | 28.02.2003 | [2018/10] |
Former [2015/21] | AT | 13.02.2003 | |
GB | 13.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 13.02.2003 | |
GB | 13.02.2003 | ||
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 13.02.2003 | |
CH | 28.02.2003 | ||
LI | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 28.02.2003 | |
LI | 28.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4662043 (STONE WILLIAM S [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 5, line 11 - line 21 * * abstract * [A] 2-5,7-9; | [A]EP0450383 (LEBRECHT HORST DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 25 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 13 * * abstract *; | [DA]DE4135418 (EMIL STARK GMBH [AT])[DA] 1-9 |