EP0862079 - Digital camera having synchronized movement of lens and flash [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoyama, Kouji 1935-5 Toukaichiba, Midori-ku Yokohama / JP | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102907.7 | 19.02.1998 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | JP19970062337 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: JP 6233797 | JP19970082258 | 14.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8225897 | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0862079 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0862079 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862079 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03B15/05, G03B17/04, H04N5/225 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
H04N23/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/23] |
Former [1998/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Digitale Kamera mit synchronisierten Linsen- und Blitzgerätbewegungen | [2002/10] | English: | Digital camera having synchronized movement of lens and flash | [1998/36] | French: | Caméra numérique avec mouvement synchronisé de la lentille et de l'unité de flash | [1998/36] |
Former [1998/36] | Digitale Kamera mit synchronisierter Linsen- und Blitzgerätbewegungen | Examination procedure | 19.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 21.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 13.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.05.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 18.12.2002 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/30] | NL | 18.12.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0836207 ; | [A]JPH0829835 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08036207 A 19960206 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-69 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08029835 A 19960202 (CANON INC) [A] 1-69 * abstract * |