EP0865972 - Airbag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | [1998/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spary, Anton Im Striethof 10 73577 Ruppertshofen / DE | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98102914.3 | 19.02.1998 | [1998/39] | Priority number, date | DE1997204975U | 18.03.1997 Original published format: DE 29704975 U | [1998/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865972 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0865972 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865972 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
B60R21/2338 (EP,US);
B60R21/213 (EP,US);
B60R21/232 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23386 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2375 (EP,US);
B60R21/20 (EP,US);
B60R21/237 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/37] |
Former [1998/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gassack | [1998/39] | English: | Airbag | [1998/39] | French: | Coussin gonflable | [1998/39] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 02.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.02.2004 | ES | 20.02.2004 | [2006/12] |
Former [2005/01] | GB | 19.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29613781U (HS TECH & DESIGN [DE]) [A] 1 * page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 20; figures 1,13 *; | [A]GB2297950 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [A] 1 * page 11, paragraph 2; figures 6-8 * |