EP0860533 - Method for embroidering oversized patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.M. PFAFF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Königstrasse 154 67655 Kaiserslautern / DE | [1998/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herbach, Mathias Schubertstrasse 17 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 02 /
Holl, Helmar Im Säuterich 44 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Kessler, Rolf Hildebrandstrasse 33 76227 Karlsruhe / DE | [1998/35] | Application number, filing date | 98103064.6 | 21.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | DE1997107527 | 25.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19707527 | DE1997156351 | 18.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756351 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860533 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860533 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | [1999/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D05B19/12, D05B21/00 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
D05B19/12 (EP,US);
D05B21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [1999/51] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sticken übergrosser Muster | [1998/35] | English: | Method for embroidering oversized patterns | [1998/35] | French: | Procédé pour broder des motifs surdimensionnés | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/20] | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH05337266 ; | [X]JPH0430891 ; | [Y]JPH02228997 ; | [A]US5553559 (INOUE TOMO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 37 - column 7, line 17 *; | [A]JPH05269265 ; | [A]JPH03210296 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940325), vol. 018, no. 176, Database accession no. (C - 1183), & JP05337266 A 19931221 (JANOME SEWING MACH CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * [Y] 5 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920513), vol. 016, no. 198, Database accession no. (C - 0939), & JP04030891 A 19920203 (JANOME SEWING MACH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901130), vol. 014, no. 543, Database accession no. (C - 0783), & JP02228997 A 19900911 (JANOME SEWING MACH CO LTD) [Y] 5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940124), vol. 018, no. 043, Database accession no. (C - 1156), & JP05269265 A 19931019 (JANOME SEWING MACH CO LTD) [A] 5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911209), vol. 015, no. 484, Database accession no. (C - 0892), & JP03210296 A 19910913 (JANOME SEWING MACH CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |