EP0864733 - Cooling system for an internal combustion engine, particularly for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GATE S.r.l. Via Andrea Doria 15 10123 Torino / IT | [2003/49] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states Gate S.p.A. Via Andrea Doria 15 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states GATE S.p.A. Corso Alessandria 395 I-14100 Asti / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bartolazzi, Andrea Via delle Carrozze, 55 00187 Roma / IT | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98103342.6 | 26.02.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | IT1997TO00205 | 13.03.1997 Original published format: IT TO970205 | [1998/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0864733 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0864733 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
F01P7/164 (EP,US);
F01P2005/125 (EP,US);
F01P2007/143 (EP,US);
F01P2025/04 (EP,US);
F01P2025/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/27] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, LI | ||
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kühlungsanlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1998/38] | English: | Cooling system for an internal combustion engine, particularly for motor vehicles | [1998/38] | French: | Système de refroidissement pour un moteur à combustion interne, notamment pour véhicules automobiles | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 17.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE19539604 (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0557113 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 18 - line 45 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 29; figure - *; | [A]DE3810174 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US3302696 (ROGERS JAMES R) [A] 1,3 * figure - * |