EP0876759 - Device for locking the entry gate of electrical fences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOGL, Georg Pröbstlsberg 8 82383 Hohenpeissenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states Vogl, Georg Pröbstlsberg 8 82383 Hohenpeissenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Brose, D. Karl, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/46] | Brose, D. Karl, et al Patentanwälte Brose & Brose Postfach 11 64 82301 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98103411.9 | 27.02.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | DE1997208033U | 06.05.1997 Original published format: DE 29708033 U | [1998/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0876759 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0876759 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01K3/00 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
A01K1/0017 (EP);
A01K3/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/01] |
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verschliessen der Eingänge in elektrischen Weidezäunen | [1998/46] | English: | Device for locking the entry gate of electrical fences | [1998/46] | French: | Dispositif pour verrouiller l'entrée des clôtures électriques | [1998/46] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/09] | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2642683 (MEYER JR ALOYS H) [A] 1* column 1, line 5 - line 35; figure - *; | [A]US3908964 (LEIBLICH GORDON FRANCIS) [A] 1 * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0124376 (DAIRY DEV LTD [NZ]) [A] 1; | [A]CH653858 (NIROX AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2206906 (MARSON CHRISTOPHER JOHN) [A] 1 * the whole document * |