EP0863419 - Optical fiber ferrule sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | For all designated states SEIKO INSTRUMENTS INC. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Setsuo, Shouji c/o Nasutekku Precision Co., Ltd. 31-1, Kameido 6-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Masahiko, Tsunemi c/o Nasutekku Precision Co., Ltd 31-1, Kameido 6-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo / JP | [1998/37] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/37] | Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98103516.5 | 27.02.1998 | [1998/37] | Priority number, date | JP19970052147 | 06.03.1997 Original published format: JP 5214797 | [1998/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0863419 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
G02B6/3874 (EP,US);
G02B6/3877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1999/21] |
Former [1998/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Faseroptische Steckerstifthülse | [1998/37] | English: | Optical fiber ferrule sleeve | [1998/37] | French: | Manchon pour viroles de fibres optiques | [1998/37] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 12.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19629510 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 7, line 15 - line 62; figures 7A,B * [A] 4; | [A]EP0543094 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * figure 3 *; | [A]JPS6432210 ; | [X]EP0185413 (PHILIPS NV) [X] 3 * abstract *; | [X]JPS5940612 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890519), vol. 013, no. 215, Database accession no. (P - 874), & JP01032210 A 19890202 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840630), vol. 008, no. 141, Database accession no. (P - 283), & JP59040612 A 19840306 (MATSUSHITA DENKO KK) [X] 3 * abstract * |