EP0864405 - Method for manufacturing laminated wood tiles with surface machining, and tile manufactured with said method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piarottolegno S.p.A. Via Noalese, 160 30036 Santa Maria di Sala Venezia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states Piarottolegno S.p.A. Via Noalese, 160 30036 Santa Maria di Sala, Venezia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nava, Paolo Via Padre Reginaldo Giuliani, 47 20035 Lissone, Prov. of Milano / IT | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98103580.1 | 02.03.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | IT1997PD00047 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: IT PD970047 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0864405 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0864405 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B27D1/04, B44C1/22, B44C5/04 | [1999/45] | CPC: |
A47B96/205 (EP);
B44C1/222 (EP);
B44C5/043 (EP);
B44C5/0461 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/38] | B27D1/04, B44C1/22 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/29] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Holzverbundfliese mit Oberflächenbearbeitung und Fliese hergestellt mit diesem Verfahren | [1998/38] | English: | Method for manufacturing laminated wood tiles with surface machining, and tile manufactured with said method | [1998/38] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de carreaux en bois laminé avec usinage de surface, et carreaux ainsi obtenus | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/02] | 21.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.06.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5591657 ; | [A]RU2048289 ; | [A]DE2133390 (RICHTER HARALD DR) [A] 1 * figure 2; claim - *; | [A]FR2214027 (ANTEN FORETS) [A] 1 * claim - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 34, Database accession no. 80-59668C, XP002115488 & JPS5591657 A 19800711 (TOMA KOBAN KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 29, Database accession no. 96-285289, XP002115489 & RU2048289 C 19951120 (MUKHANOV V N) [A] 1 * abstract * |