EP0866361 - X-ray cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Refusal of application | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Manfred Steingriffer Strasse 4 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [1998/39] | Application number, filing date | 98103777.3 | 04.03.1998 | [1998/39] | Priority number, date | DE1997111584 | 19.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19711584 | [1998/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0866361 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0866361 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | [1999/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03B42/04 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
G03B42/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR [2000/35] |
Former [1998/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Röntgenkassette | [1998/39] | English: | X-ray cassette | [1998/39] | French: | Cassette radiographique | [1998/39] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 22.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/48] | 05.07.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4961000 (J.FINKENZELLER) [Y] 1,4 * column 2; figures 1,2 * * column 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 7; | [Y]US4589125 (M.SCHMIDT) [Y] 1,4 * column 2 - column 5; figures 1-4 *; | [DY]DE2917547 (AGFA-GEVAERT A.G.) [DY] 1 * page 7 - page 11; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE8520091U (R.GOLLWITZER) [A] 2,3 * page 6 - page 8; figures 1-3 * |