EP0846925 - Refrigerant circulating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirahara, Takuho, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Tatsuaki, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Masuda, Noboru, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Konishi, Hiroshige, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 05 /
Kawaguchi, Susumu, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 06 /
Kawasaki, Katsuyuki, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 07 /
Ogasawara, Shinobu, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 08 /
Maruyama, Hitoshi, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 09 /
Sumida, Yoshihiro, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1-1, Tsukaguchi, honmachi 8-chome, Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo / JP | 10 /
Toyama, Satoru, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Zairyo Device Kenkyusho, 1-1, Tsukaguchi-honmachi 8-chome, Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo / JP | 11 /
Akahori, Yasushi, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika, 3-chome Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 12 /
Ueyama, Akemi, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Zairyo Device Kenkyusho, 1-1, Tsukaguchi-honmachi 8-chome, Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo / JP | 13 /
Suzuki, Sou, c/o Mitusbishi Denki K.K. Shizuoka Seisakusho, 18-1, Oshika 3-chome, Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98104147.8 | 27.04.1994 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | JP19930101264 | 27.04.1993 Original published format: JP 10126493 | JP19930300220 | 30.11.1993 Original published format: JP 30022093 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0846925 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0846925 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F25B31/00, F25B43/00, F25B9/00, // C10M171/00 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
F25B31/002 (EP);
C09K5/045 (EP);
C10M171/008 (EP);
F04C23/008 (EP);
F25B43/006 (EP);
F25B9/006 (EP);
C09K2205/22 (EP);
C09K2205/24 (EP);
C09K2205/32 (EP);
C09K2205/34 (EP);
C10M2201/066 (EP);
C10M2203/06 (EP);
C10M2203/10 (EP);
C10M2203/102 (EP);
C10M2203/104 (EP);
C10M2203/106 (EP);
C10M2203/108 (EP);
C10M2205/00 (EP);
C10M2205/02 (EP);
C10M2207/023 (EP);
C10M2207/024 (EP);
C10M2207/026 (EP);
C10M2207/04 (EP);
C10M2207/042 (EP);
C10M2207/121 (EP);
C10M2207/122 (EP);
C10M2207/125 (EP);
C10M2207/129 (EP);
C10M2207/402 (EP);
C10M2209/00 (EP);
C10M2209/02 (EP);
C10M2209/10 (EP);
C10M2211/02 (EP);
C10M2211/022 (EP);
C10M2211/042 (EP);
C10M2211/044 (EP);
C10M2211/06 (EP);
C10M2211/08 (EP);
C10M2215/02 (EP);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/064 (EP);
C10M2215/065 (EP);
C10M2215/26 (EP);
C10M2219/00 (EP);
C10M2219/068 (EP);
C10M2219/082 (EP);
C10M2219/086 (EP);
C10M2219/087 (EP);
C10M2219/089 (EP);
C10M2219/10 (EP);
C10M2219/102 (EP);
C10M2219/104 (EP);
C10M2219/106 (EP);
C10M2219/108 (EP);
C10M2221/02 (EP);
C10M2223/04 (EP);
C10M2223/042 (EP);
C10M2223/045 (EP);
C10M2223/047 (EP);
C10M2227/00 (EP);
C10M2229/041 (EP);
C10N2040/00 (EP);
C10N2040/30 (EP);
C10N2040/32 (EP);
C10N2040/34 (EP);
C10N2040/36 (EP);
C10N2040/38 (EP);
C10N2040/40 (EP);
C10N2040/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/24] | Title | German: | Umlaufanlage für Kältemittel | [1998/24] | English: | Refrigerant circulating system | [1998/24] | French: | Système de circulation de frigorigène | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/11] | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94303024.7 / EP0622445 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.07.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1620713 (BELL FRED C); | [A]US1899378 (ZOUCK GEORGE H, et al) [A] 1,9 * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 40; figures 2,5-9 *; | [A]US2314591 (MCCORMACK ALEX A) [A] 7,8 * page 1, column L, line 55 - page 2, column R, line 49; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3796064 (LADUSAW W) [A] 6 * column 3, line 1 - line 6; figure 2 *; | [A]US4586351 (IGARASHI YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [A] 7 * column 3, line 50 - line 60; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0343662 (CPI ENG SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9005172 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4,5 * page 9, line 21 - page 11, line 3 *; | [A]US5076064 (KOPKO WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 6 *; | [A]EP0485979 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 45 - page 26, line 47; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]EP0498317 (LINDE AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 17 - page 4, line 20; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0516093 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * column 6, line 24 - line 58 * |