EP0864481 - Shock absorbing steering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takabatake, Yoshikazu, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Hering, Hartmut Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104171.8 | 09.03.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | JP19970081947 | 14.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8194797 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0864481 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0864481 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0864481 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/19 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
B62D1/192 (EP,US);
B62D1/184 (EP,US);
B62D1/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/19] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stossdämpfervorrichtung für eine Lenksäule | [1998/38] | English: | Shock absorbing steering device | [1998/38] | French: | Dispositif amortisseur de choc pour colonne de direction | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03015825.7 / EP1354782 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3923319 (NONAKA MASAKATSU, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 26 - line 47 * * column 4, line 40 - line 47 ** figures 1,8 *; | [X]US4241937 (DANNER EDWARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 11 - line 55 * * column 3, line 41 - line 45 * * figures 1,3 * | by applicant | JPH0717411 | JPH08150944 |