EP0949373 - Friction damper in particular for washing machines with a spin phase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUSPA Holding GmbH Industriestrasse 12 - 14 90518 Altdorf / DE | [2000/22] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states SUSPA COMPART Aktiengesellschaft Industriestrasse 12-14 90518 Altdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Hans-Peter Ziegelhütte 9 90518 Altdorf / DE | 02 /
Ehrnsberger, Manfred Kettenbacher Weg 23 92348 Berg / DE | 03 /
Rössner, Reiner Hofbachweg 6 90518 Altdorf / DE | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104207.0 | 10.03.1998 | [1999/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949373 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/20, F16F7/08 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
F16F7/08 (EP);
D06F37/20 (EP);
F16F13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 30.01.1999 | Title | German: | Reibungsdämpfer, insbesondere für Waschmaschinen mit Schleudergang | [1999/41] | English: | Friction damper in particular for washing machines with a spin phase | [1999/41] | French: | Amortisseur à friction en particulier pour machines à laver avec phase d'essorage | [1999/41] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 14.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 20.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/50] | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2459912 (ESSWEIN SA) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 2 * * page 3, line 4 - line 15 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 11 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4-11; | [A]EP0080243 (AMIENS CONST ELECT MEC ;PHILIPS NV (NL)) [A] 1,4 * page 4, line 3 - page 5, line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0027753 (ESSWEIN SA) [A] 1,4,10 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0336176 (BAUER FRITZ & SOEHNE OHG) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4427336 (AKO WERKE GMBH & CO) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4087085 (HAUSER HENRY K) [A] 1 * abstract * |