EP0865030 - Apparatus for calculating a posterior probability of phoneme symbol, and speech recognition apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATR Interpreting Telecommunications Research Laboratories 5 Koaza-Sanpeidani, Oaza-Inuidani, Seika-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto 619-0288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states ATR Interpreting Telecommunications Research Laboratories 5 Koaza-Sanpeidani, Oaza-Inuidani, Seika-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuster, Mike 24-401, Takanohara Ekinishi Danchi, 1-2, Kabutodai Kizu-cho, Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0224 / JP | 02 /
Fukada, Toshiaki 12-20, Jingu 5-chome Nara-shi, Nara 631-0804 / JP | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1998/38] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104222.9 | 10.03.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | JP19970056138 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: JP 5613897 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865030 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0865030 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G10L5/06 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
G10L15/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/48] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Berechnung einer a posteriori Wahrscheinlichkeit eines Phonemsymbols und Spracherkennungsvorrichtung | [1998/38] | English: | Apparatus for calculating a posterior probability of phoneme symbol, and speech recognition apparatus | [1998/38] | French: | Dispositif de calcul d'une probabilité a posteriori d'un phonème et dispositif de reconnaissance de la parole | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/39] | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - SCHUSTER M ET AL, "BIDIRECTIONAL RECURRENT NEURAL NETWORKS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (199711), vol. 45, no. 11, pages 2673 - 2681, XP000754251 [PX] 1,3,9,11 * figure 3 * * figure 6 * * paragraph [II.B] * * paragraph [III.A] * * paragraph [III.B] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.650093 | [A] - SCHUSTER M, "Learning out of time series with an extended recurrent neural network", NEURAL NETWORKS FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING VI. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY WORKSHOP (CAT. NO.96TH8205), NEURAL NETWORKS FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING VI. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1996 IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY WORKSHOP, KYOTO, JAPAN, 4-6, ISBN 0-7803-3550-3, 1996, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 170 - 179, XP002090473 [A] 1,3,9,11 | [DA] - ROBINSON A J, "AN APPLICATION OF RECURRENT NETS TO PHONE PROBABILITY ESTIMATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, (19940301), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 298 - 305, XP000441811 [DA] 1,3,9,11 * paragraph [IV.G] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/72.279192 | [A] - ALLEN R B ET AL, "RECURRENT NEURAL NETWORK FOR WORD IDENTIFICATION FROM PHONEME SEQUENCES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING (ICSLP), KOBE, NOV. 18 -22, 1990, ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (19901118), vol. 2, pages 1037 - 1040, XP000506940 [A] 1,3,9,11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0002] * | [A] - BRIDLE J S, "ALPHA-NETS: A RECURRENT 'NEURAL' NETWORK ARCHITECTURE WITH A HIDDEN MARKOV MODEL INTERPRETATION", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, (19900201), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 83 - 92, XP000149378 [A] 1,3,9,11 * table 1 * * paragraph [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-6393(90)90049-F |