EP0867660 - Monitoring device of a burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krieger, Klaus Wilhelmstrasse 10 73249 Wernau / DE | [1998/40] | Application number, filing date | 98104241.9 | 10.03.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | DE1997112373 | 25.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19712373 | [1998/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0867660 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867660 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/12 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
F23N5/123 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/23] |
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Überwachen eines Brenners | [1998/40] | English: | Monitoring device of a burner | [1998/40] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance d'un brûleur | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 15.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0634611 (JOHNSON SERVICE CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 3, line 1 - line 45; figure - *; | [X]GB2156103 (EMERSON ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1,2,6 * page 2, line 39 - line 46; figure 1A *; | [X]DE2825478 (LANDIS & GYR AG) [X] 1-4,6 * column 2, line 18 - line 59; figure . *; | [X]US3610789 (JONES WILLIAM H) [X] 1-4,6 * column 3, line 7 - line 66; figure - *; | [X]AU510294B (PHILIPS IND HOLDINGS LTD) [X] 1-4,6 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [X]US3627458 (WADE KENNETH R) [X] 1-4 * figure - * | by applicant | EP0525345 |