EP0867585 - Profile part for the connection of plane elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coers, Martin Helgenweg 6 35325 Mücke/OT Nieder-Ohmen / DE | For all designated states Coers, Stefan Herrmannsbergweg 28 35325 Mücke/OT Windhain / DE | [1998/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedrich, Horst Kiefernweg 26 55543 Bad Kreuznach / DE | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Knefel, Cordula Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24 35529 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Knefel, Cordula, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24 35529 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104258.3 | 10.03.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | DE1997112627 | 26.03.1997 Original published format: DE 19712627 | [1998/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0867585 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0867585 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05D3/06, E05D5/02 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
A47K3/36 (EP);
E05D3/122 (EP);
E05D2005/0269 (EP);
E05D5/0246 (EP);
E05Y2800/162 (EP);
E05Y2900/114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] |
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 10.03.1998 | Title | German: | Profilteil zur Verbindung flächiger Teile | [1998/40] | English: | Profile part for the connection of plane elements | [1998/40] | French: | Partie profilée pour le raccordement d'éléments plans | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/40] | 11.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/12] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE8701832U (HALLENGREN) [X] 1-4,7-12,14-21,24 * page 3, line 4 - page 7, line 28; figures 1-3 * [Y] 5,6,13,22,25-27; | [Y]GB2106176 (MARLER HALEY EXPOSYSTEMS) [Y] 5,6,13,22 * page 1, line 81 - line 107 * * page 2, line 125 - page 3, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US4953261 (LYONS) [Y] 25-27 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 20; figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]US5337451 (GOOSSENS) [A] 23 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-6 * |