EP0941727 - Disposable absorbent undergarment having a continuous elasticized waistband [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitz, Christoph Johann Dr.-Lieser-Strasse 2 53881 Euskirchen-Stotzheim / DE | [1999/37] | Representative(s) | Kohol, Sonia, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Kohol, Sonia, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [1999/37] | Kohol, Sonia, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 98104437.3 | 12.03.1998 | [1999/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0941727 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1999/37] | CPC: |
A61F13/496 (EP,KR);
A61F13/49011 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/21] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Absorbierende Wegwerfunterhose mit kontinuierlichem, elastifiziertem Tailenband | [1999/37] | English: | Disposable absorbent undergarment having a continuous elasticized waistband | [1999/37] | French: | Sous-vêtement absorbant à jeter muni d'une ceinture élastique, continue | [1999/37] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/03] | 23.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.05.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.05.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2294865 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [X] 1-9 * page 10, line 12 - line 19; figure 4; claim 8 *; | [A]WO9409736 (PROCTER & GAMBLE FAR EAST INC [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0255500 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [A] 1,5-8 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4585447 (KARAMI HAMZEH [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0638304 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,5-8 * column 2, line 26 - line 30; claims 1,2,16 * | by applicant | US5545158 | US4940464 | US4720415 | US4657802 | US4652487 | US4663220 | EP0217032 | US4861652 |