EP0873756 - Antibacterial blood compatible modified surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft 60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 45764 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anders, Christine, Dr. Birkenrith 25 45721 Haltern / DE | 02 /
Lorenz, Günter, Dr. Alsenstrasse 29 52068 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Höcker, Hartwig, Prof. Dr. Am Dorbach 23 52076 Aachen / DE | [1998/44] | Application number, filing date | 98104584.2 | 13.03.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | DE1997116606 | 21.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19716606 | [1998/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0873756 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0873756 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61L33/00 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
A01N59/02 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bakterienabweisend und blutverträglich modifizierte Oberflächen | [1998/44] | English: | Antibacterial blood compatible modified surfaces | [1998/44] | French: | Surfaces modifiées antibactériennes et hémocompatibles | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO9417904 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [DX] 1,2,5,6,8-10 * claims 1,5,7,9,12-16 *; | [X]US3839743 (SCHWARCZ A) [X] 8-10 * example 6 *; | [A]EP0629445 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - line 51 * | [X] - HOCKER H ET AL, "POLYMERS FOR MEDICAL USES", MACROMOLECULAR SYMPOSIA, RHEIN WESTFAL TH AACHEN, LEHRSTUHL TEXT CHEM & MAKROMOLEK CHEM, VELTMANPL 8, D-52062 AACHEN, GERMANY (Reprint);RHEIN WESTFAL TH AACHEN, DEUTSCH WOLLFORSCHUNGSINST, D-52062 AACHEN, GERMANY, (199601), vol. 102, pages 421 - 427, XP002142981 [X] 1,8-10 * page 423, paragraphs 5,6 * |