EP0872292 - Machine for bending of elongate members such as tubes, bars or profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLM S.p.A. Via Selvaregina, 30 I-22063 Cantu / IT | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biella, Marioalberto Via San Vitale, 25 22038 - Seregno (MI) / IT | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Mayer, Hans Benno de Dominicis & Mayer S.r.l. Piazzale Marengo, 6 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Mayer, Hans Benno, Dipl.-Ing. de Dominicis & Mayer S.r.l. Piazzale Marengo, 6 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98104916.6 | 18.03.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI00644 | 21.03.1997 Original published format: IT MI970644 | [1998/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0872292 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0872292 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0872292 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B21D7/024 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
B21D7/024 (EP,KR,US);
B21D43/027 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/35] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Title | German: | Maschine zum Biegen länglicher Teile, wie Rohre, Stangen oder Profile | [1998/43] | English: | Machine for bending of elongate members such as tubes, bars or profiles | [1998/43] | French: | Machine pour le cintrage d'éléments allongés tels que tubes, barres ou profilés | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 24.06.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT | 13.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2002
03.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE Pedrazzoli IBP S.p.A. Viale Pecori Giraldi, 51-53 I-36061 BASSANO DEL GRAPPA (VICENZA) / IT Opponent's representative Ferroni, Filippo Dragotti & Associati Srl Via Nino Bixio, 7 20129 Milano / IT | 02
18.12.2002
13.10.2003
WITHDRAWN TRUMPF Rohrtechnik GmbH + Co. KG Keltenstrasse 26 72766 Reutlingen-Mittelstadt / DE Opponent's representative Schmitt, Martin Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2002
03.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE Pedrazzoli IBP S.p.A. Viale Pecori Giraldi, 51-53 I-36061 BASSANO DEL GRAPPA (VICENZA) / IT Opponent's representative Ferroni, Filippo DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI SRL, Galleria San Babila 4/C 20122 Milano / IT | ||
02
18.12.2002
13.10.2003
WITHDRAWN TRUMPF Rohrtechnik GmbH + Co. KG Keltenstrasse 26 72766 Reutlingen-Mittelstadt / DE Opponent's representative Schmitt, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2003/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2002
03.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE Pedrazzoli IBP S.p.A. Viale Pecori Giraldi, 51-53 I-36061 BASSANO DEL GRAPPA (VICENZA) / IT Opponent's representative Ferroni, Filippo DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI SRL, Galleria San Babila 4/C 20122 Milano / IT | ||
02
18.12.2002
WITHDRAWN TRUMPF Rohrtechnik GmbH + Co. KG Keltenstrasse 26 72766 Reutlingen-Mittelstadt / DE Opponent's representative Schmitt, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
Former [2002/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2002
03.05.2002
ADMISSIBLE Pedrazzoli IBP S.p.A. Viale Pecori Giraldi, 51-53 I-36061 BASSANO DEL GRAPPA (VICENZA) / IT Opponent's representative Ferroni, Filippo DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI SRL, Galleria San Babila 4/C 20122 Milano / IT | 13.06.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.10.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.10.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.11.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 29.06.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/01] | Appeal following opposition | 22.01.2004 | Appeal received No. T0126/04 | 24.03.2004 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2004/13] | 06.04.2004 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/15] | 29.06.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.08.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.08.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2003/33] |
Former [2002/18] | FR | 21.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0446819 (MEWAG MASCHINENFABRIK AG [CH]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 38; figures 1-8; claim 1 *; | [X]DE1527394 (RAGACHE CLAUDE) [X] 1 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 14; figures 1,4-7 *; | [A]EP0417703 (BLM SPA [IT]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4485658 (STEWART A K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 37; figures 1,2,8 *; | [A]US5010758 (TOGOSHI HIDEAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * pages 1-3 * |