EP0870886 - Device for leveling an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peterhans, Dieter Alte Birmensdorferstrasse 11 5442 Fislisbach / CH | [1998/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98105204.6 | 23.03.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | CH19970000852 | 11.04.1997 Original published format: CH 85297 | [1998/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870886 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870886 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04F21/18, E04B9/20 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
E04B9/183 (EP,US);
E04B9/205 (EP,US);
E04F21/1838 (EP,US);
Y10S33/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/25] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Nivellierung eines Objektes | [1998/42] | English: | Device for leveling an object | [1998/42] | French: | Dispositif de nivelage d'un objet | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 29.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 15.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, IE, LU, MC | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.11.2003 | NL | 12.11.2003 | DK | 12.02.2004 | GR | 12.02.2004 | SE | 12.02.2004 | ES | 23.02.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | PT | 12.04.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2005/14] | NL | 12.11.2003 | |
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | NL | 12.11.2003 | |
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
ES | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | NL | 12.11.2003 | |
DK | 12.02.2004 | ||
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 12.11.2003 | |
GR | 12.02.2004 | ||
SE | 12.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 12.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0472509 ; | [A]US3775929 (ROODVOETS R, et al) [A] 1,10-12,14-18 * column 3, line 11 - column 7, line 64; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP0559489 (LASER ALIGNMENT [US]) [A] 1,7,12,18,19 * column 3, line 46 - column 9, line 5; figures 1-12 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920619), vol. 016, no. 276, Database accession no. (P - 1374), & JP04072509 A 19920306 (INOBEESHIYON SENTAA KK) [A] 1,4,11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | US5484026 |