EP0870943 - Heavy duty viscous fan drive and bracket mounting assembly therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 3001 West Big Beaver Road Suite 200 P.O. Box 5060 Troy MI 48007-5060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc. 3001 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 5060 Troy, Michigan 48007-5060 / US | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Light, Gerald Marion 344 Perrett Road Marshall, Michigan 49068 / US | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105404.2 | 25.03.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | US19970831549 | 09.04.1997 Original published format: US 831549 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870943 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870943 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16D35/02 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
F16D35/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/25] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochbelastbarer viskose Ventilatorantrieb sowie Haltevorrichtung dafür | [1998/42] | English: | Heavy duty viscous fan drive and bracket mounting assembly therefor | [1998/42] | French: | Entraînement visqueux à usage intensif d'un ventilateur et support de fixation pour celui-ci | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 01.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0316137 (EATON CORP [US]) [Y] 1 * column 12, line 13 - column 13, line 42; figure 3 * [A] 2,3,6,7; | [YA]DE4442451 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 13 - column 4, line 46; figure 1 * [A] 4,5; | [A]EP0540006 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,6 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 *; | [A]US5555963 (MARTIN HANS [DE]) [A] * figure 1 *; | [A]US4531621 (HAZEL MICHAEL E [US]) [A] * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3215235 (KAMM LAWRENCE J) [A] * figure 1 * | Examination | US3262528 |