EP0870552 - Device for forming a closed stack of flat mail items [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Christoph Aachstrasse 40 88682 Salem / DE | 02 /
Mok, Josef Liggeringerstrasse 5 78476 Allensbach / DE | 03 /
Lohmann, Boris An der Gete 148 28211 Bremen / DE | 04 /
Zimmermann, Armin Mainauerstrasse 196B 78464 Konstanz / DE | 05 /
Märtin, Uwe Zum Hinterhag 6 78464 Konstanz / DE | [1998/42] | Application number, filing date | 98105412.5 | 25.03.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | DE1997114185 | 07.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19714185 | [1998/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0870552 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0870552 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | [1999/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870552 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B07C3/06, B07C1/02 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
B07C1/025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/42] | B07C3/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/43] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Bildung eines geschlossenen Stapels von flachen Sendungen | [1998/42] | English: | Device for forming a closed stack of flat mail items | [1998/42] | French: | Dispositif de formation d'une pile fermée d'envois plats | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.06.2002 | GB | 26.06.2002 | IT | 26.06.2002 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 26.06.2002 | |
GB | 26.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 26.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0661106 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [DY] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19545716 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0696482 (FINMECCANICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,2,4,7 * abstract *; | [A]DE4117434 (WINKLER DUENNEBIER KG MASCH [DE]) |