EP0872434 - Magnetic conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Mischtechnik GmbH Postfach 145 88423 Bad Schussenried / DE | [1998/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumeister, Kurt, Dipl.-Ing. Schwanenweg 5 88422 Bad Buchau / DE | 02 /
Kletsch, Reinhold, Dipl.-Ing. Goethestrasse 2 88422 Bad Buchau / DE | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/43] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105429.9 | 25.03.1998 | [1998/43] | Priority number, date | DE1997207008U | 18.04.1997 Original published format: DE 29707008 U | [1998/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0872434 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65G15/58, B28C5/40 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
B28C7/06 (EP);
B23Q11/0057 (EP);
B28C5/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/26] |
Former [1998/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetförderer | [1998/43] | English: | Magnetic conveyor | [1998/43] | French: | Transporteur à aimant | [1998/43] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 05.08.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58224902 (NOBUTAKA OOTA) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]LU85775 (DECHMANN) [A] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]SU1765019 (VASILEV VLADIMIR YA ;SAMODUROV VLADIMIR N (SU); PETRAKOV BORIS (SU) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]JPS57151511 (MITSUBISHI SEIKOU JIZAI KK) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]FR2561217 (ETAB. VALLET) [AD] 1 * figures 1-14 *; | [A]FR1365738 (WIBAU) [A] 2 * page 2, column L, line 4 - line 19; figure 1 *; | [XP]DE29707008U (LIEBHERR-MISCHTECHNIK) [XP] 1-7 * figures 1,2; claims 1-7 * |