EP0856993 - Set top terminal for cable television delivery systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS, INC. 7700 Wisconsin Avenue Bethesda, MD 20814-3522 / US | [1998/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hendricks, John S. 8723 Persimmon Tree Road Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
Bonner, Alfred E. 8300 Bradley Boulevard Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | 03 /
Berkobin, Eric C. 108 Hillview Court Woodstock, GA 30188 / US | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1998/32] | Application number, filing date | 98105647.6 | 02.12.1993 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | US19920991074 | 09.12.1992 Original published format: US 991074 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0856993 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0856993 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856993 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N7/173 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
H04N21/4786 (EP,US);
H04N7/16 (KR);
H04H20/06 (EP,US);
H04H20/10 (EP,US);
H04H20/42 (EP,US);
H04H20/79 (EP,US);
H04H20/86 (EP,US);
H04H60/04 (EP,US);
H04H60/13 (EP,US);
H04H60/39 (EP,US);
H04H60/47 (EP,US);
H04H60/72 (EP,US);
H04N21/2181 (EP,US);
H04N21/21815 (EP,US);
H04N21/2187 (EP,US);
H04N21/2221 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23608 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/2381 (EP,US);
H04N21/2389 (EP,US);
H04N21/252 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/258 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US);
H04N21/26208 (EP,US);
H04N21/26283 (EP,US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4184 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/42206 (EP,US);
H04N21/42653 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4385 (EP,US);
H04N21/44204 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4668 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04N21/47211 (EP,US);
H04N21/47214 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
H04N21/4788 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US);
H04N21/64307 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US);
H04N21/6547 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N21/8146 (EP,US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,US);
H04N21/8173 (EP,US);
H04N21/8586 (EP,US);
H04N5/44504 (EP,US);
H04N5/602 (EP,US);
H04N7/088 (EP,US);
H04N7/0882 (EP,US);
H04N7/0884 (EP,US);
H04N7/0887 (EP,US);
H04N7/10 (EP,US);
H04N7/102 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
H04N7/173 (EP,US);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
H04N7/17336 (EP,US);
H04N7/17354 (EP,US);
H04H20/02 (EP,US);
H04H20/78 (EP,US);
H04H20/95 (EP,US);
H04H2201/70 (EP,US);
H04H60/22 (EP,US);
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04H60/66 (EP,US);
H04H60/74 (EP,US);
H04H60/94 (EP,US);
H04H60/96 (EP,US);
H04H60/97 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (EP,US);
H04N5/45 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/32] | Title | German: | Aufsatz- Endgerät für Kabelfernsehverteilsysteme | [1998/32] | English: | Set top terminal for cable television delivery systems | [1998/32] | French: | Terminal privé placé sur un récepteur de télévision pour systèmes de diffusion de programmes de télévision par câble | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 12.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94903362.5 / EP0673581 | Divisional application(s) | EP01113921.9 / EP1164797 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.07.2002 | GR | 31.07.2002 | IT | 31.07.2002 | NL | 31.07.2002 | DK | 31.10.2002 | SE | 31.10.2002 | PT | 14.11.2002 | [2008/12] |
Former [2003/48] | BE | 31.07.2002 | |
GR | 31.07.2002 | ||
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
DK | 31.10.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
PT | 14.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 31.07.2002 | |
NL | 31.07.2002 | ||
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 31.07.2002 | |
SE | 31.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 31.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8601962 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [Y] 15 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0328440 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [Y] 1,12 * abstract * [A] 2-11,13,14,16-20; | [YA]WO9100670 (SUPERGUIDE CORP [US]) [Y] 1,12,15,21 * the whole document * [A] 2-11,13,14,16-20,22; | [A]US5144663 (KUDELSKI ANDRE [CH], et al) [A] 1-10,18-20 * the whole document *; | [YA]WO9217027 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [Y] 21 * the whole document * [A] 22; | [AP]EP0570785 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [FR]) [AP] 1-10,18-20* abstract * |