EP0869683 - Image pickup device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Akira c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105787.0 | 30.03.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | JP19970098429 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 9842997 | JP19980052523 | 04.03.1998 Original published format: JP 5252398 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0869683 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0869683 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869683 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/04, H04N5/225 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
H04N1/58 (EP,US);
H04N23/686 (EP,US);
H04N23/58 (EP,US);
H04N23/60 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
H04N23/687 (EP,US);
H04N23/73 (EP,US);
H04N23/843 (EP,US);
H04N25/134 (EP,US);
H04N25/48 (EP,US);
H04N2209/046 (EP,US);
H04N2209/048 (EP,US);
H04N2209/049 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/46] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung | [1998/41] | English: | Image pickup device | [1998/41] | French: | Dispositif de prise d'images | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS7240869 ; | [Y]US3975760 (YAMANAKA SEISUKE, et al) [Y] 7* figure 5 *; | [X]DE3837063 (LENZ REIMAR, DR., 8000 MÜNCHEN, GERMANY) [X] 1,6,8 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US5475769 (WOBER MUNIB A [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 2, lines 11-17 * * column 3, lines 51-54 *; | [LXY]US6031569 (NOBUOKA KOUSUKE [JP], et al) [LX] 1,6 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 31 * [LY] 2,7 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 01, & JP72040869 A 19950912 (CANON INC) [X] 1,6 * abstract * [Y] 2,7 |