EP0869036 - Electronic equipment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-91 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-91 / JP | ||
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-91 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takayama, Masatoshi 53-9, Nakano 2-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohmura, Hiroshi 5-5, Shikigaoka 6-chome Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Hirashima, Isao 18-13, Une 1-chome, Kaitacho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 04 /
Fujita, Nagahisa 11-5, Ohzu 5-chome, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 05 /
Shoji, Futoshi 9-15-9, Hataka 1-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 06 /
Otsubo, Yoshinori 2751-137, Kodani, Takayacho Higashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2006/02] |
Former [2001/16] | 01 /
Takayama, Masatoshi 53-9, Nakano 2-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ohmura, Hiroshi 5-5, Shikigaoka 6-chome Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Hirashima, Isao 18-13, Une 1-chome, Kaitacho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Fujita, Nagahisa 11-5, Ohzu 5-chome, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Shoji, Futoshi 9-15-9, Hataka 1-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Otsubo, Yoshinori 2751-137, Kodani, Takayacho Hihashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
Former [1998/41] | 01 /
Takayama, Masatoshi 53-9, Nakano 2-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ohmura, Hiroshi 5-5, Shikigaoka 6-chome Hatsukaichi-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Hirashima, Tsao 18-13, Une 1-chome, Kaitacho Aki-gun, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Fujita, Nagahisa 11-5, Ohzu 5-chome, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Shoji, Futoshi 9-15-9, Hataka 1-chome, Aki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Otsubo, Yoshinori 2751-137, Kodani, Takayacho Hihashihiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/41] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98105878.7 | 31.03.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | JP19970081581 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8158197 | JP19970081741 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8174197 | JP19970081742 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8174297 | JP19970081743 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8174397 | JP19970096675 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 9667597 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0869036 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0869036 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0869036 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0869036 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, B60R16/02, B60K37/00 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
B60R16/0315 (EP,US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/50 (EP,US);
B60R11/02 (EP,US);
B60R11/0205 (EP,US);
B60R11/0211 (EP,US);
B60R11/0235 (EP,US);
B60R11/0258 (EP,US);
B60R11/0264 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0005 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0043 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0047 (EP,US);
B60R2011/027 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0288 (EP,US);
B60R2011/0294 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/41] | B60R11/02, B60R16/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/40] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für elektronische Ausrüstung | [1998/41] | English: | Electronic equipment apparatus | [1998/41] | French: | Appareil pour équipement électronique | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 11.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 31.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.10.2005 | GB | 31.03.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/29] | GB | 31.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5175926 (CHAPMAN MAX C [US]) [A] 1-48 * column 2, line 11 - line 14 * * column 2, line 40 - line 45; figures 1-3 * * abstract *; | [A]US5353190 (NAKAYAMA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - line 57; figures 4,5 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0676314 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [A] 1-4,7-9,14-16,20,21,28-32 * column 2, line 24 - line 35; figure 4 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0701926 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al); | [A]US5546273 (HARRIS WAYNE [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 60 - line 67 * * column 2, line 16 - line 24; figures 2,5,17 * * abstract * | Examination | DE3514438 | JPS61244636 | EP0338405 | US5175926 | JPH06107082 | WO9809846 |