EP0875621 - Hollow braided line made from synthetic fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seilerei Sembritzky GmbH Stralsunder Strasse 15 17489 Greifswald / DE | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sembritzky, Jörg Grosse Wallstrasse 7 17506 Gützkow / DE | 02 /
Sembritzky-Panknin, Ute Grosse Wallstrasse 7 17506 Gützkow / DE | [1998/51] |
Former [1998/45] | 01 /
Sembritzky, Jörg * 17506 Gützlow / DE | ||
02 /
Sembritzky-Panknin, Ute * 17506 Gützlow / DE | Representative(s) | Meyerhöfer, Dietmar Patentanwalt Rudolf-Petershagen-Allee 12 17489 Greifswald / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Meyerhöfer, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Rudolf-Petershagen-Allee 12 17489 Greifswald / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106039.5 | 02.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | DE1997113706 | 03.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19713706 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875621 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D07B1/12 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
D04C1/12 (EP);
D07B1/12 (EP);
D07B1/20 (EP);
D07B5/005 (EP);
D07B2201/1096 (EP);
D07B2501/2038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/28] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drahthohlflechtleine aus Chemiefaserstoff | [1998/45] | English: | Hollow braided line made from synthetic fibres | [1998/45] | French: | Ligne creuse tressée en fibres synthétiques | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 01.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/22] | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2311499 (P.CASSIN) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 21 - line 29 * * page 2, line 5 - line 15 *; | [A]FR2197392 (ETS. KERSAUDY & LE MEUR) [A] 1 * figures 1-5; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US3486409 (T.W.POWELL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 51 * * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 12 *; | [A]US4228207 (P.PORTE; J.TOGNY) |