EP0878854 - Alkaline battery separator and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN VILENE COMPANY, LTD. 14-5, Sotokanda 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [2006/41] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states JAPAN VILENE COMPANY, LTD. 14-5, Sotokanda 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Masanao c/o Japan Vilene Co. Ltd. 7, Oazakitatone, Sowa-machi, Sashima-gun Ibaraki 306-02 / JP | 02 /
Tokutake, Nobutoshi, c/o Japan Vilene Co. Ltd. 7, Oazakitatone, Sowa-machi, Sashima-gun Ibaraki 306-02 / JP | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106122.9 | 03.04.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | JP19970101073 | 03.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10107397 | JP19970139355 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13935597 | JP19970139356 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13935697 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0878854 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0878854 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878854 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16, H01M10/24, D04H1/22, D04H1/54 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
D01F8/06 (EP,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/44 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/49 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/732 (EP,US);
D04H5/02 (EP,US);
D04H5/06 (EP,US);
H01M10/28 (KR);
H01M50/403 (KR);
H01M50/446 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/19] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Alkalische Batterieseparator und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1998/47] | English: | Alkaline battery separator and process for producing the same | [1998/47] | French: | Séparateur de pile alcaline et procédé de fabrication | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 20.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH08138645 ; | [A]JPH08273650 ; | [DA]JPH0729561 ; | [A]US5609976 (UEDA TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4-6,17,18* column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 1; figure 1; claim 1 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 096, no. 009, & JP08138645 A 19960531 (DAIWABO CO LTD) [DA] 1-5,7,9,12,15,17,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, & JP08273650 A 19961018 (JAPAN VILENE CO LTD) [A] 1,11,16-19 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 095, no. 004, & JP07029561 A 19950131 (DAIWABO CO LTD) [DA] 1,4,5,17 * abstract * |