EP0875766 - Circuit device and method for inspecting the connection of a switch or push button [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/17] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tislaric, Darko Paul-Zweigart-Strasse 4 71063 Sindelfingen / DE | [1998/45] | Application number, filing date | 98106197.1 | 04.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | DE1997118041 | 29.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19718041 | [1998/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875766 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875766 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875766 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/327, G01R31/02, G01R31/04, G08B29/04, B60R16/02 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
G01R31/3272 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/45] | G01R31/02, G01R31/04, G01R31/327 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/09] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung und Verfahren zur Überprüfung der Kontaktierung eines Schalters oder Tasters | [1998/45] | English: | Circuit device and method for inspecting the connection of a switch or push button | [1998/45] | French: | Circuit et procédure d'inspection de raccordement d'un interrupteur ou d'un bouton-poussoir | [2005/41] |
Former [1998/45] | Circuit et procédure d'inspection du raccordement d'un interrupteur ou d'un bouton-poussoir | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 08.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.07.2006 | GB | 26.07.2006 | IT | 26.07.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/12] | GB | 26.07.2006 | |
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | GB | 26.07.2006 | |
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | SE | 26.10.2006 | |
ES | 06.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05174282 ; | [X]DE4240447 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * column 1, lines 3-8 * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 16 * * column 4, lines 2-4; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0615267 (LANDIS & GYR BUSINESS SUPPORT [CH]) [A] 1,2,8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2159285 (CAMBRIDGE INSTR LTD) [A] 1,2,8-10 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931027), vol. 017, no. 590, Database accession no. (P - 1635), & JP05174282 A 19930713 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0013] - [0015] - [0024] - [0027]; figures 1,2 * |