EP0949095 - Device for cooling engines and for heating the interior of a hybrid vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Management Services AG Seevorstadt 6 2501 Biel / CH | [1999/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonntag, Rainer Büntengasse 37 6264 Pfaffnau / CH | 02 /
Apter, Robert Löhrenweg 43 2504 Biel / CH | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A. Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Balsters, Robert, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets S.A., 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 98106321.7 | 07.04.1998 | [1999/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0949095 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0949095 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/03, F01P3/20 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
B60K6/22 (EP,US);
B60H1/00 (KR);
B60H1/004 (EP,US);
B60H1/034 (EP,US);
B60H1/2218 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (EP,US);
F01P3/20 (EP,US);
B60L2240/34 (EP,US);
F01P2005/105 (EP,US);
F01P2007/146 (EP,US);
F01P2050/24 (EP,US);
F01P2060/08 (EP,US);
F01P2060/18 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/26] |
Former [1999/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Kühlung von Antriebseinheiten und zur Innenraumbeheizung eines Hybridfahrzeuges | [1999/41] | English: | Device for cooling engines and for heating the interior of a hybrid vehicle | [1999/41] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement des moteurs et du chauffage de l'intérieur d'un véhicule hybride | [1999/42] |
Former [1999/41] | Dispositif de refroidissement des moteurs et du chauffage d l'intérieur d'un véhicle hybride | Examination procedure | 13.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.07.2003 | SE | 02.10.2003 | ES | 13.10.2003 | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 02.07.2003 | |
SE | 02.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | SE | 02.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3245740 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]); | [A]DE3447182 (KROMBERG & SCHUBERT [DE]); | [Y]DE4431191 (HIMMELSBACH JOHANN [DE]); | [XY]DE4435693 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE], et al); | [Y]US5531285 (GREEN ROSS M [GB]) | by applicant | DE3245740 |