EP0859241 - Time-sharing radar system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komatsu, Satoru c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama-ken, 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Ashihara, Jun 6-31-15, Daita, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 155 / JP | [1998/37] |
Former [1998/34] | 01 /
Komatsu, Satoru Fujimi-ohkuhaitsu 308, 2-19, Kamitakaido Suginami-ku, Tokyo 168 / JP | ||
02 /
Ashihara, Jun 6-31-15, Daita, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 155 / JP | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/34] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K.Fincke F.A.Weickmann, B.Huber Dr. H.Liska, Dr. J.Prechtel, Dr. B.Böhm, Dr. W.Weiss, Dr. M.Herzog Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98106487.6 | 31.08.1993 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | JP19930051443 | 17.02.1993 Original published format: JP 5144393 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859241 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0859241 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/42, G01S13/34 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
G01S13/87 (EP,US);
G01S13/345 (EP,US);
G01S13/424 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S13/34 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1998/34] | Title | German: | Time-Sharing-Radarsystem | [1998/34] | English: | Time-sharing radar system | [1998/34] | French: | Système de radar à temps partagé | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 26.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93113926.5 / EP0611969 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3513471 (MOONEY DAVID H JR, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 49 - line 67 ** column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 1 *; | [A]WO8808544 (SUNDSTRAND DATA CONTROL [US]) [A] 1 * figures 3A,3B * * page 13, line 20 - page 14, line 22 *; | [X]GB2219471 (COSSOR ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * figure 2; claim 1 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 9 * | Examination | US5181037 |